LA HB289 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-20 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the collection of certain evidence from victims of rape offenses
Title
Provides relative to the collection of certain evidence from victims of rape offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. |
2015-05-14 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2015-04-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2015-04-01 | House | Prefiled. |