LA HB287 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date: 05/10/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date: 05/10/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to laws concerning abortion based on genetic abnormality
Title
Provides relative to laws concerning abortion based on genetic abnormality
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 287 FINAL PASSAGE (#714) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 287 FINAL PASSAGE (#360) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 287 FINAL PASSAGE (#360) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Effective date: 05/10/2018. |
2018-05-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 77. |
2018-05-08 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |