LA HB283 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to parole eligibility for certain juveniles (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to parole eligibility for certain juveniles (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-03 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-27 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-02-27 | Prefiled. |