LA HB281 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to preemption of state law for firearms
Title
Provides relative to preemption of state law for firearms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 281 FINAL PASSAGE (#472) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 281 AMENDMENT # 2101 BY JAMES MOTION TO ADOPT (#471) (Y: 29 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 281 CALL FROM THE CALENDAR (#363) (Y: 53 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 281 AMENDMENT # 2101 BY JAMES MOTION TO ADOPT (#471) (Y: 29 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 281 CALL FROM THE CALENDAR (#363) (Y: 53 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-21 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19. |
2019-05-15 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (8-7-1). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |