LA HB277 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to severance tax revenues remitted to parishes in which the associated severance occurs (RE -$46,900,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to severance tax revenues remitted to parishes in which the associated severance occurs (RE -$46,900,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 277 FINAL PASSAGE (#312) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023. |
2023-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0-1). |
2023-04-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported favorably (13-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |