LA HB277 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Received from the Senate with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of alcohol and tobacco control to suspend or revoke permits of certain alcoholic beverage dealers for failure to pay taxes (EG1 NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of alcohol and tobacco control to suspend or revoke permits of certain alcoholic beverage dealers for failure to pay taxes (EG1 NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 277 FINAL PASSAGE (#410) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 277 FINAL PASSAGE (#183) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-05-20SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-16SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-14SenateReported with amendments.
2019-05-08SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-05-07SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-07HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/07/19.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB277&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120254
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127628
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133795
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136069
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136017
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120284
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127222
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127810
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129082
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133883
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132018
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135783

Bill Comments

feedback