LA HB277 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the "Authentic Louisiana" wild seafood certification program criteria
Title
Expands the "Authentic Louisiana" wild seafood certification program criteria
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2016-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |