LA HB274 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an individual income tax checkoff for the U.S.S. KIDD (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Title
Creates an individual income tax checkoff for the U.S.S. KIDD (EN NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 274 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#938) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 274 AMENDMENT # 3107 BY DORSEY-COLOMB HB 274 BY FOIL (#800) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 274 FINAL PASSAGE (#422) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 274 AMENDMENT # 3107 BY DORSEY-COLOMB HB 274 BY FOIL (#800) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 274 FINAL PASSAGE (#422) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 388. |
2015-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. |
2015-05-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-01 | House | Prefiled. |