LA HB271 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the regulation of used motor vehicles (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the regulation of used motor vehicles (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 271 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#959) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 271 FINAL PASSAGE (#817) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Vote on HB 271 FINAL PASSAGE (#100) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-31HouseEffective date: 08/01/2016.
2016-05-31HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 288.
2016-05-25HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2016-05-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2016-05-24HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-05-23HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2016-05-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2016.
2016-05-17HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2016-05-17SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-05-16SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-05-12SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-05-11SenateReported with amendments.
2016-04-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2016-03-31SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-03-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-03-30HouseCalled from the calendar.
2016-03-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/30/2016.
2016-03-29HouseNotice given.
2016-03-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2016-03-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/29/2016.
2016-03-23HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-03-22HouseReported favorably (19-0).
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2016-03-04HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
2016-03-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2016-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=16rs&b=HB271&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=978474
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=986447
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=988990
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1005769
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1008883
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=987855
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002494
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1003257
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004759
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1005674
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=978510
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=986664
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=989003
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002339
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1002602
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1014292
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1015319
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=988940
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1004219

Bill Comments

feedback