LA HB271 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the state uniform construction code
Title
Provides relative to the state uniform construction code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 271, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#808) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 271, FINAL PASSAGE (#723) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 271, FINAL PASSAGE (#236) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 271, FINAL PASSAGE (#723) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 271, FINAL PASSAGE (#236) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-07-01 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 391. | |
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-22 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-19 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-19 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-13 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-09 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2011-05-23 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2011. | |
2011-05-17 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-16 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |