LA HB27 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the assessor in Orleans Parish to provide property owners with a form for permanent registration of the homestead exemption (EN -$67,000 LF EX See Note)
Title
Requires the assessor in Orleans Parish to provide property owners with a form for permanent registration of the homestead exemption (EN -$67,000 LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 27, CONCUR IN SENATE (#570) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 27, FINAL PASSAGE (#420) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 27, FINAL PASSAGE (#147) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 27, FINAL PASSAGE (#420) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 27, FINAL PASSAGE (#147) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-20 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 58. | |
2011-06-15 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-02 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-01 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-31 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-17 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2011-05-16 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-16 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2011. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2011-05-10 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-03-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/18/2011. | |
2011-03-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-03-15 | Prefiled. |