LA HB269 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for free expression on college campuses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for free expression on college campuses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 269 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#827) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 269 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 269 AMENDMENT # 2824 BY MORRISH HB 269 BY HARRIS L. (#734) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 269 FINAL PASSAGE (#454) (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 269 FINAL PASSAGE (#370) (Y: 46 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2017-06-07HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2017-06-05HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
2017-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-06-02SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-06-01SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-06-01SenateRules suspended.
2017-06-01SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2017-05-30SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2017-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-24HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-24HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17.
2017-05-23HouseNotice given.
2017-05-23HouseNotice removed
2017-05-23HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-05-23HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2017-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17.
2017-05-22HouseNotice given.
2017-05-22HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2017-05-18HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 46, nays 34. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
2017-05-18HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
2017-05-15HouseNotice given.
2017-05-15HouseNotice removed
2017-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/17.
2017-05-11HouseNotice given.
2017-05-11HouseNotice removed
2017-05-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17.
2017-05-10HouseNotice given.
2017-05-10HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2017-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17.
2017-05-03HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-02HouseReported with amendments (9-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2017-03-30HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2017-03-30HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB269&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1029581
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037976
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045028
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049389
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037792
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1039825
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041367
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044185
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046958
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047525
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047862
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048771
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049330
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1029625
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038191
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045041
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047128
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1052479
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043311
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047863

Bill Comments

feedback