LA HB265 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Effective date: 03/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to registration and voting by a person convicted of a felony (EN +$66,698 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to registration and voting by a person convicted of a felony (EN +$66,698 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 265 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1319) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 265 FINAL PASSAGE (#1226) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 265 FINAL PASSAGE (#904) (Y: 59 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 265 FINAL PASSAGE (#904) (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 265 FINAL PASSAGE (#904) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 265 FINAL PASSAGE (#681) (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 265 FINAL PASSAGE (#480) (Y: 35 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseEffective date: 03/01/2019.
2018-05-31HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 636.
2018-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-17HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 54, nays 42, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-17HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-17HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
2018-05-16HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-16SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-14SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-14SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-10SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-05-10HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 42. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-10HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-08HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
2018-05-08HouseNotice given.
2018-05-08HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2018-05-08HouseRules suspended.
2018-05-08HouseMotion to reconsider called from the table.
2018-05-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 43. Failed to pass.
2018-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18.
2018-04-25HouseNotice given.
2018-04-25HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-04-25HouseReconsidered.
2018-04-25HouseMotion to reconsider called from the table.
2018-04-17HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 35, nays 53. Failed to pass.
2018-04-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18.
2018-04-12HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-11HouseReported favorably (7-2).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB265&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1069664
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085402
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095329
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099216
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103409
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086648
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087448
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096838
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098359
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098513
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098919
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1069667
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075969
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085570
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086612
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095412
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096010
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100004
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087742
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092751
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095291
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095387
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095647
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098115

Bill Comments

feedback