LA HB263 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for insurance coverage of step therapy or fail first protocols

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for insurance coverage of step therapy or fail first protocols

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 263 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#673) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 263 FINAL PASSAGE (#474) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 263 FINAL PASSAGE (#282) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: 06/11/2020.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 181.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-28SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-21HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2020-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB263&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1160142
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171934
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175194
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178554
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181914
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171480
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171906
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173073
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174935
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175071
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176338
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177461
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178298
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1160160
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172177
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175212
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176686
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186446
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175111
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177187

Bill Comments

feedback