LA HB261 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the qualifications of the members of the municipal fire and police civil service board (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the qualifications of the members of the municipal fire and police civil service board (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 261 FINAL PASSAGE (#811) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 261 FINAL PASSAGE (#446) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 261 FINAL PASSAGE (#446) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-15 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 280. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2021-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |