LA HB261 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the term of imprisonment for certain offenses concerning prostitution shall be served at hard labor when the offense involves a person under a certain age (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides that the term of imprisonment for certain offenses concerning prostitution shall be served at hard labor when the offense involves a person under a certain age (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 261 FINAL PASSAGE (#492) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 261 FINAL PASSAGE (#119) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 261 FINAL PASSAGE (#119) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 83. |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-22 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-21 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/24/2013. |
2013-04-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2013-03-26 | House | Prefiled. |