LA HB26 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 06/26/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the transfer of certain property near Spanish Lake in Iberia Parish

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the transfer of certain property near Spanish Lake in Iberia Parish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 26 ADOPT (#959) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 26 MOTION TO ADOPT (#941) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 26 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#819) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 26 AMENDMENT # BY MILLS FINAL PASSAGE (#702) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 26 FINAL PASSAGE (#51) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26HouseEffective date: 06/26/17.
2017-06-26HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 389.
2017-06-12HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
2017-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-08HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2017-06-08SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2017-06-08SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2017-06-08HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2017-06-07HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2017-06-07SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Chabert, Mills, and Perry.
2017-06-06SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2017-06-06HouseHouse conferees appointed: Barras, Bishop, and Huval.
2017-06-06SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2017-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2017-06-05HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
2017-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-06-02SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-31SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-31SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-30SenateReported with amendments.
2017-04-27SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-04-26HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/26/17.
2017-04-20HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably (15-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2017-02-24HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2017.
2017-02-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2017-02-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB26&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022603
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034171
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050593
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1052435
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044939
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046894
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047703
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049163
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049312
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022614
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034347
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045342
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046759
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050216
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036097
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050396
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050444

Bill Comments

feedback