LA HB26 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Effective date: 8/01/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides with respect to powers of the governing authority of St. Charles Parish relative to grass cutting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides with respect to powers of the governing authority of St. Charles Parish relative to grass cutting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 26 FINAL PASSAGE (#467) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 26 FINAL PASSAGE (#104) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05HouseEffective date: 8/01/2015.
2015-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 41.
2015-05-28HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-05-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-05-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2015-05-25SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-19SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-18SenateReported favorably.
2015-05-04SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2015-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2015-04-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2015.
2015-04-27HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-04-22HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2015-02-20HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/20/2015.
2015-02-20HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2015-02-20HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=HB26&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=925512
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=941034
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943283
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951710
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=957412
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=941371
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=942599
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=925531
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=941258
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943412
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=962377
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=943128
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=951428

Bill Comments

feedback