LA HB259 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to employment for persons with disabilities (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to employment for persons with disabilities (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 259 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#910) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 259 CO-AUTHORS (#532) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 259 FINAL PASSAGE (#531) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 259 FINAL PASSAGE (#445) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11HouseEffective date: 06/11/2021.
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 194.
2021-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-03SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-02HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-01HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/02/2021.
2021-05-26HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-25SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-24SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-20SenateReported with amendments.
2021-05-18SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2021-05-17SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-13HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021.
2021-05-10HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-06HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2021-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB259&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208170
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222085
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230929
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235205
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221006
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221750
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222043
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226649
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227762
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208174
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219566
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222138
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222365
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226799
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228902
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232047
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238175
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224696
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228758
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228759
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230873

Bill Comments

feedback