LA HB259 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to arrest records provided to institutions of postsecondary education requesting criminal history information on a prospective employee
Title
Provides relative to arrest records provided to institutions of postsecondary education requesting criminal history information on a prospective employee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 259 FINAL PASSAGE (#1105) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 259 FINAL PASSAGE (#143) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 259 FINAL PASSAGE (#143) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2014. |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 326. |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014. |
2014-03-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2014-02-21 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014. |
2014-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2014-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |