LA HB256 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to payroll deductions for teachers and other school employees for organization dues

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to payroll deductions for teachers and other school employees for organization dues

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 256 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1100) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 256 FINAL PASSAGE (#893) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 256 FINAL PASSAGE (#213) (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-07-20HouseVeto message read. Lies over under the rules.
2021-06-29HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 72, nays 28, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-03SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-02SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-04HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-28HouseReported favorably (9-2).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB256&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208051
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218346
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233484
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232108
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1208065
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218591
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232922
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236619
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238114
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220906
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232588
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233384

Bill Comments

feedback