LA HB256 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the rate and exemption for the severance tax on oil produced from incapable wells (RE2 -$2,500,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to the rate and exemption for the severance tax on oil produced from incapable wells (RE2 -$2,500,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 256 FINAL PASSAGE (#89) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-04-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-04-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19. |
2019-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |