LA HB255 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Allows for the use of the Budget Stabilization Fund for the state costs associated with a declared disaster (EG SD EX See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Allows for the use of the Budget Stabilization Fund for the state costs associated with a declared disaster (EG SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 255 FINAL PASSAGE (#520) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 2. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-30 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17. |
2017-05-25 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17. |
2017-05-23 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported without amendments (6-0-1). |
2017-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-03-30 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-03-30 | House | Prefiled. |