LA HB255 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Effective date: May 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Effective date: May 11, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the transfer of specified property by the Orleans Parish School Board
Title
Authorizes the transfer of specified property by the Orleans Parish School Board
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Abramson [D] | Rep. Jared Brossett [D] | Rep. Walt Leger [D] | Rep. Nicholas Lorusso [R] |
Rep. Helena Moreno [D] | Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D] | Sen. Edwin Murray [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 255, FINAL PASSAGE (#767) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 255, FINAL PASSAGE (#444) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 255, FINAL PASSAGE (#444) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-11 | Effective date: May 11, 2012. | |
2012-05-11 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 74. | |
2012-05-09 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-08 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-07 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-02 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-01 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-30 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-23 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2012-04-19 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-18 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-12 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/18/2012. | |
2012-04-12 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-11 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-27 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-26 | Read by title. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-27 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |