LA HB254 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Hearing: May 29 @ 12:00 pm in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Repeals provisions in the Louisiana Constitution related to various funds (RR SEE FISC NOTE GF RV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Repeals provisions in the Louisiana Constitution related to various funds (RR SEE FISC NOTE GF RV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#494) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2023-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-05-17HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2023-05-17HouseCalled from the calendar.
2023-05-17HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2023-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023.
2023-05-09HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-08HouseReported with amendments (10-0-1).
2023-04-20HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2023-04-19HouseReported favorably (17-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2023-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2023-04-03HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
2023-03-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2023-03-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=23rs&b=HB254&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1306387
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1313461
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1319846
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323478
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1319786
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1314574
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1306396
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1312648
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1313686
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1313794
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1319957
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1320066
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323570
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323637
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1323329

Bill Comments

feedback