LA HB253 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Revises terminology referring to the deaf and hard of hearing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises terminology referring to the deaf and hard of hearing

Sponsors

Rep. Patricia Smith [D]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]
Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]
Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]
Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]
Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. George Cromer [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]
Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]
Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]
Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]Rep. Jeff Hall [D]Rep. Jimmy Harris [D]
Rep. Kenneth Havard [R]Rep. Bob Hensgens [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]
Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Frank Howard [R]Rep. Marcus Hunter [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]
Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]
Rep. Robert Johnson [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Nancy Landry [R]Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]
Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]
Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Helena Moreno [D]Rep. James Morris [R]
Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]Rep. Edward Price [D]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]
Rep. Jerome Richard [I]Rep. John Schroder [R]Rep. Robert Shadoin [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]
Rep. John Stefanski [D]Rep. Major Thibaut [D]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]
Sen. John Alario [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Conrad Appel [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]
Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]Sen. Norby Chabert [R]Sen. Dan Claitor [R]
Sen. Yvonne Dorsey-Colomb [D]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Jack Donahue [R]Sen. Dale Erdey [R]
Sen. James Fannin [R]Sen. Ryan Gatti [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]
Sen. Eric LaFleur [D]Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]
Sen. Daniel Martiny [R]Sen. John Milkovich [D]Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]
Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Jonathan Perry [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]
Sen. Neil Riser [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. John Smith [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]
Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Mack White [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 253 CO-AUTHORS (#578) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 253 FINAL PASSAGE (#577) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 253 FINAL PASSAGE (#263) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12HouseEffective date: 08/01/17.
2017-06-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 146.
2017-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-02SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-05-31HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2017-05-31SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-25SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-25SenateRules suspended.
2017-05-24SenateReported favorably.
2017-05-15SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-05-11SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-10HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17.
2017-05-03HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-02HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2017-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB253&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1028860
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1037697
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040664
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046747
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051379
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040243
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1028880
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1038141
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040738
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1053354
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040507
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046597
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046598

Bill Comments

feedback