LA HB250 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for appropriations from the Education Excellence Fund (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for appropriations from the Education Excellence Fund (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#609) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2022. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2022-04-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |