LA HB250 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for payment of judgment in the matter of "Jean Boudreaux and the Victims of the Flood of April 6, 1983, on the Tangipahoa River v. State of La., et al"
Title
Appropriates funds for payment of judgment in the matter of "Jean Boudreaux and the Victims of the Flood of April 6, 1983, on the Tangipahoa River v. State of La., et al"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-02-21 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014. |
2014-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |