LA HB25 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to parish and municipal libraries
Title
Provides relative to parish and municipal libraries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2023-02-17 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/17/2023. |
2023-02-14 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2023-02-14 | House | Prefiled. |