LA HB25 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to participation of charter school employees in the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (OR INCREASE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to participation of charter school employees in the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (OR INCREASE APV)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2018-01-26HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018.
2018-01-25HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2018-01-25HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback