LA HB25 | 2016 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Effective date: 06/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Reduces the amount of the income tax credit for the Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation Assessment and makes the reduction permanent (Item #46) (EN +$17,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduces the amount of the income tax credit for the Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation Assessment and makes the reduction permanent (Item #46) (EN +$17,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 25 FINAL PASSAGE (#36) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 25 FINAL PASSAGE (#6) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-28HouseEffective date: 06/28/2016.
2016-06-28HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 9.
2016-06-19HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2016-06-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2016-06-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-06-17HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2016-06-16SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-06-15SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-06-15SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-06-14SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2016-06-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-06-09HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-06-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/09/2016.
2016-06-07HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-06-07HouseRules suspended.
2016-06-07HouseReported favorably (9-8).
2016-06-06HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2016-06-05HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2016-06-05HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=162ES&b=HB25&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1010175
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011024
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1012357
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1014297
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1010184
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1010875
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011074
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011215
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1012517
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1016198
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011320
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1012321

Bill Comments

feedback