LA HB25 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the reemployment of retirees of the Firefighters' Retirement System (EG DECREASE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the reemployment of retirees of the Firefighters' Retirement System (EG DECREASE APV)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-05HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2016-03-31HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/05/2016.
2016-03-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-03-28HouseReported with amendments (9-0).
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2016-01-29HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/22/2016.
2016-01-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2016-01-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback