LA HB25 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to membership in the Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System and the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (EG DECREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to membership in the Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System and the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (EG DECREASE APV)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/01/2014. |
2014-03-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported with amendments (6-3). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2014-01-17 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/17/2014. |
2014-01-15 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2014-01-15 | House | Prefiled. |