LA HB25 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-30 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: Senate Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the conversion of unused sick and annual leave to retirement credit for members of the Firefighters' Retirement System (EG INCREASE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the conversion of unused sick and annual leave to retirement credit for members of the Firefighters' Retirement System (EG INCREASE APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 25 FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-30SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2013-04-29SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2013-04-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2013-04-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2013.
2013-04-23HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-04-22HouseReported with amendments (11-0) (Regular).
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2013-02-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2013.
2013-02-20HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2013-02-20HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback