LA HB25 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an exemption to the subject matter exam for licensed arborists who apply for a landscape, grading, and beautification building contractors' license in order to perform certain arborist work
Title
Establishes an exemption to the subject matter exam for licensed arborists who apply for a landscape, grading, and beautification building contractors' license in order to perform certain arborist work
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 25, CONCUR SENATE AMENDMENTS (#811) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 25, FINAL PASSAGE (#710) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 25, FINAL PASSAGE (#80) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 25, FINAL PASSAGE (#80) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 25, FINAL PASSAGE (#710) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 25, FINAL PASSAGE (#80) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 25, FINAL PASSAGE (#80) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 163. | |
2012-05-16 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-16 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2012-05-07 | Scheduled for concurrence on 5/14/2012. | |
2012-05-02 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-30 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-25 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-02 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2012-03-29 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-03-28 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-03-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on 3/28/2012. | |
2012-03-20 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-03-19 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2012-01-30 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012. | |
2012-01-26 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2012-01-26 | Prefiled. |