LA HB25 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-26 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts La. Citizens Property Insurance Corp. from posting bonds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts La. Citizens Property Insurance Corp. from posting bonds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Vote on HB 25, FINAL PASSAGE (#364) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-26 Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2010-04-26 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2010-04-22 Scheduled for floor debate on April 26, 2010.
2010-04-19 Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2010-04-15 Reported with amendments (12-0-1) (Regular).
2010-03-29 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2010-02-12 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/12/2010.
2010-02-11 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2010-02-11 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback