LA HB249 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Signed by the President of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to community service litter abatement programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to community service litter abatement programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 249 FINAL PASSAGE (#409) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 249 FINAL PASSAGE (#19) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-21HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-20HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-05-20SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-16SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-15SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-24SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2019-04-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/22/19.
2019-04-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-15HouseReported with amendments (6-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB249&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119756
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124457
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126120
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136006
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124036
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124440
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125669
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119777
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124548
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126158
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126068
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135781

Bill Comments

feedback