LA HB249 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective date: 08/01/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the payment of fines, fees, costs, restitution, and other monetary obligations related to an offender's conviction (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the payment of fines, fees, costs, restitution, and other monetary obligations related to an offender's conviction (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 249 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#892) (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 249 FINAL PASSAGE (#824) (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 249 FINAL PASSAGE (#518) (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15HouseEffective date: 08/01/18.
2017-06-15HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 260.
2017-06-07HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-07HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 65, nays 27, Senate amendments concurred in.
2017-06-06HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17.
2017-06-05HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-06-05SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-06-04SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-06-04SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-30SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2017-05-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-30HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-05-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17.
2017-05-25HouseNotice given.
2017-05-25HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2017-05-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
2017-05-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-17HouseReported with amendments (13-3).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2017-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2017-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB249&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1028851
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042868
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046027
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049837
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051827
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041647
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042741
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042964
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043478
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048157
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048529
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048838
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049939
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1028871
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040212
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042934
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044576
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046120
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047975
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048231
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048556
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050082
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1053290
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045987
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048623

Bill Comments

feedback