LA HB249 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Effective date: 05/11/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the regulation of regional notification centers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the regulation of regional notification centers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 249 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#571) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 249 FINAL PASSAGE (#405) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 249 FINAL PASSAGE (#257) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-11HouseEffective date: 05/11/2016.
2016-05-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 85.
2016-05-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2016-05-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-05-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2016-04-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016.
2016-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2016-04-26SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-04-25SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-04-21SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-04-20SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2016-04-12SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2016-04-11SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-04-11HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-04-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2016.
2016-04-05HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-04-04HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2016-03-04HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
2016-03-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2016-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=16rs&b=HB249&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=978453
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=990025
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999943
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1003383
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=986529
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=989967
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=996901
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=998854
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=999870
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=978500
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=990582
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1016895
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=993185
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=997787

Bill Comments

feedback