LA HB247 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Becomes HB 1279.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the sale of raw milk by a farmer to a consumer

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the sale of raw milk by a farmer to a consumer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-29HouseBecomes HB 1279.
2014-04-28HouseReported by substitute (9-6).
2014-03-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2014-02-21HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014.
2014-02-20HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2014-02-20HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback