LA HB246 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-10-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the secretary of the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to certify "organizations involved in charitable hunting and fishing activities" and waives license fees for such organizations (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the secretary of the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to certify "organizations involved in charitable hunting and fishing activities" and waives license fees for such organizations (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#678) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 246 2/3 vote (#677) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 246 PERMISSION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#703) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#248) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 178.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2020-05-31SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-31HouseNotice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-31SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-31SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-31HouseBy a vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
2020-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-28SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2020-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-05-21HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20.
2020-05-15HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-13HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2020-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2020-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB246&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1159967
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172110
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178611
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181911
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1159981
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164690
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172205
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172312
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179336
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1187242
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175002
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178394
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178496
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178498

Bill Comments

feedback