LA HB246 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 05/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 05/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of insurance to apply for a state innovation waiver to establish and implement a reinsurance program
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of insurance to apply for a state innovation waiver to establish and implement a reinsurance program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#1329) (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#1294) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#167) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#1294) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 246 FINAL PASSAGE (#167) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Effective date: 05/30/2018. |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 684. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Reconsidered. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 13 nays. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |