LA HB244 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain business records to be self-authenticated
Title
Allows certain business records to be self-authenticated
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 244 ADOPT (#960) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 244 SUSPEND THE RULES (#940) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 244 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#801) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 244 FINAL PASSAGE (#653) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 244 FINAL PASSAGE (#43) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 244 SUSPEND THE RULES (#940) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 244 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#801) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 244 FINAL PASSAGE (#653) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 244 FINAL PASSAGE (#43) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 409. |
2017-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Martiny, and Milkovich. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Hilferty, Garofalo, and Magee. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-04-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/17. |
2017-04-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (6-0-1). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |