LA HB243 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes city court judges to serve as the attorney member of a medical review panel
Title
Authorizes city court judges to serve as the attorney member of a medical review panel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 243 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1011) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 243 FINAL PASSAGE (#630) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 243 FINAL PASSAGE (#338) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 243 FINAL PASSAGE (#630) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 243 FINAL PASSAGE (#338) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 162. |
2022-05-24 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2022. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |