LA HB243 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to opioid data reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to opioid data reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 243 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1032) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 243 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1032) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 243 ADOPT (#1013) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 243 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#887) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 243 FINAL PASSAGE (#796) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 243 FINAL PASSAGE (#438) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2019-06-06HouseConference Committee report received.
2019-06-06HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-05SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-06-04HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2019-06-04SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Barrow, Mills, and Mizell.
2019-06-04SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2019-06-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Dustin Miller, Hoffmann, and White.
2019-06-03SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-21SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-21HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably (8-2).
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-25HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB243&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119474
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127572
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143436
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144898
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126783
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127496
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140773
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141341
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141946
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1119495
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127914
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143254
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136274
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141049
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143305
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143425
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143601

Bill Comments

feedback