LA HB243 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies certain powers of the Louisiana Agricultural Finance Authority
Title
Modifies certain powers of the Louisiana Agricultural Finance Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Chaney [R] | Sen. R. Bret Allain [R] | Sen. Richard Gallot [D] | Sen. Gerald Long [R] |
Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 243 FINAL PASSAGE (#385) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 243 FINAL PASSAGE (#144) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 243 FINAL PASSAGE (#144) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 5. |
2015-05-22 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-05-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/4/2015. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2015-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2015-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |