LA HB243 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to compensation for employees of the Plaquemines Parish Sheriff's Office (EN +$35,000 LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to compensation for employees of the Plaquemines Parish Sheriff's Office (EN +$35,000 LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 243, FINAL PASSAGE (#1560) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 243, FINAL PASSAGE (#241) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 243, FINAL PASSAGE (#241) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-25 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 567. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-16 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-15 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-02 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-20 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2010-04-20 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 20, 2010. | |
2010-04-12 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-04-08 | Reported favorably (10-0-1) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2010-03-10 | Prefiled. |