LA HB242 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Effective date: May 25, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Effective date: May 25, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the position of deputy chief of police in the city of Alexandria
Title
Provides relative to the position of deputy chief of police in the city of Alexandria
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 242, FINAL PASSAGE (#1078) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 242, FINAL PASSAGE (#621) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 242, FINAL PASSAGE (#621) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Effective date: May 25, 2012. | |
2012-05-25 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 247. | |
2012-05-21 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-17 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-16 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-15 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-14 | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2012-05-02 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-02 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-25 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2012. | |
2012-04-24 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-23 | Reported favorably (11-0-1) (Regular). | |
2012-03-20 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2012-03-19 | Read by title. | |
2012-02-24 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2012. | |
2012-02-24 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |