LA HB239 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 05/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to definition of vapor products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to definition of vapor products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 239 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1304) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 239 FINAL PASSAGE (#1164) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House Vote on HB 239 FINAL PASSAGE (#425) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30HouseEffective date: 05/30/2018.
2018-05-30HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 683.
2018-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-17HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
2018-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-15SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-10SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-09SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2018-04-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-13HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/13/18.
2018-04-09HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-06HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2018-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2018-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB239&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1069460
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083906
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098913
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103808
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074213
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083880
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094065
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097924
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098857
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1069475
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083967
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094155
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1106539
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086383
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097419

Bill Comments

feedback