LA HB239 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to consumer credit loans and transactions
Title
Provides relative to consumer credit loans and transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2014-02-21 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014. |
2014-02-20 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2014-02-20 | House | Prefiled. |